Romain, Sandra (CPSO#: 79025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Chery, Sandra (used until: 26 Oct 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre De Sante communautaire
du Temiskaming
20 May Sud, CP 38
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: 705-647-5775
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Villa Long-term Care
2460 Truscott
Mississauga ON  L5J 3Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-791-8668
Fax: 905-823-7971
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Centre de Sante Communautaire
du Temiskamingue - satellite site
Earlton - 1, 9ieme rue, CP 1
Earlton ON  P0J 1E0
Canada
Phone: (705) 563-8110
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Peel Manor Long-Term Care Centre
525 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X1N9
Canada
Phone: 905-453-4140
Fax: 905-861-9140
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Centre De Sante Communautaire Du
Temiskaming
Satellite Site - Larder Lake
1, 15 Godfrey, C P 149
Larder Lake ON  P0K 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 643-2442
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Centre De Sante Communautaire Du
Temiskaming
Satellite Site - Virginiatown
61 Rue Connell, C P 159
Virginiatown ON  P0K 1X0
Canada
Phone: (705) 634-2223
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905 494-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra Romain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Romain ( CPSO# 79025 )

Business Address:
CP 149
15 Godfrey
Larder Lake ON  P0K 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 643-2442

Business Address:
Sheridan Village Long Term Care
2460 Truscott Drive
Mississauga ON  L5J 3Z8
Phone Number: (905) 791-8668

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Hamilton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Peel Manor Long Term Care
525 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6X 3C8
Phone Number: (905) 453-4140

Business Address:
Centre de Sante Communautaire
du Temiskaming
20 May Sud, CP 38
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-5775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ROMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005