Romanescu, Craita Arina (CPSO#: 81996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-9660
Fax: (905) 886-9664
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.C. Romanescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2010


Corporation Name: A.C. Romanescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Romanescu ( CPSO# 81996 )

Business Address:
8 - 9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Phone Number: (905) 886-9660

Business Address:
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4274

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 23 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., June 16, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Craita Arina Romanescu:

                  a)    Effective immediately, Dr. Romanescu shall only practise in a group
                        setting acceptable to the College;
                  
                  b)    Dr. Romanescu shall provide notice to the College of the first day
                        she returns to the practice of medicine;
                  
                  c)    If Dr. Romanescu returns to practice prior to December 1, 2015, she
                        shall undergo a practice assessment, at the College's expense,
                        within three (3) to six (6) months of her return to practice; and
                  
                  d)    If Dr. Romanescu returns to practice on or after December 1, 2015
                        she will be required to abide by the re-entry to practice procedure
                        outlined in the College policy "Re-entering Practice".

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jun 2015
Summary:

  

 On June 16, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Craita Arina Romanescu committed 
 an act of professional misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. 
 Romanescu admitted to the allegation. 
  
 In February of 2010, the College received a complaint from a patient who had been unable to 
 obtain her records despite repeated requests when Dr. Romanescu closed her office for an 
 indefinite period. Dr. Romanescu was cautioned by the College regarding the need to adhere to 
 the College’s policy “Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to 
 Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence, or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation”. 
 
In September 2011, Dr. Romanescu signed an undertaking with the College, in which she agreed 
to abide by the terms of the contract with the Physician Health Program (the “PHP”) she had 
entered in July 2011, and to remain in the monitoring arrangement with the PHP for five years.  
 
In November 2013, Dr. Romanescu was advised by the PHP that she must take a leave of 
absence from her medical practice for health reasons. She had retained an administrative person 
who was to check messages and respond to patient requests, but this relationship was terminated 
shortly after Dr. Romanescu’s leave of absence began and then there was no one to staff the 
office. Thereafter, a sign was posted on the door of Dr. Romanescu’s office  and a voicemail 
message was left on the office’s telephone system advising patients that the office was closed, 
but the voicemail message was only intermittently in place.  
 
In December 2013, Dr. Romanescu’s lawyer contacted the College to advise that Dr. Romanescu 
had no administrative staff. Over the following months, Dr. Romanescu and her lawyer attended 
at her office on several occasions to process patient record requests and the delivery of test 
results and other mail to patients.   
 
The College received nine formal complaints from patients in relation to the sudden closure of 
Dr. Romanescu’s office in November 2013: 
   -  Regarding Patient A, her husband attended Dr. Romanescu’s office and found the door 
      locked but no notice was posted advising him of any change. Patient A called the office 
      regarding her daughter’s x-ray results but there was no answer and the mailbox was full. 
      On a subsequent call, a staff member answered the phone and said he would pass the 
      message along but could not assist further. 
   -  Regarding Patient B, he attended Dr. Romanescu’s office for a scheduled visit to receive 
      a supply of pain medication before travelling. She refused to see him and told him to go 
      to a walk in clinic. His appointment was rescheduled but when he arrived at the office a 
      sign on the door advised that Dr. Romanescu would be away for an undetermined period 
      of time. Patient B was left without a renewal or his medical records to facilitate his ability 
      to obtain medication from another physician. Dr. Romanescu also forwarded the 
      government’s request for additional information regarding Patient B’s disability tax credit 
      directly to him since she was unable to practise. 
   -  Regarding Patient C, he tried to book an MRI with Dr. Romanescu but there was no 
      answer after repeated calls to her office. After finding a new physician, he had difficulty 
 

      obtaining his medical records from Dr. Romanescu. 
   -  Regarding Patient D, she was concerned that Dr. Romanescu closed her practice suddenly 
      without notice. She encountered an unprofessional staff member on the phone who did 
      not explain the process to request her medical record. 
  -  Regarding Patient E, she requires check-ups and medication refills periodically due to her 
     high blood pressure. Patient E received a recorded message saying the mailbox was full 
     when trying to book an appointment. She had difficulty finding another physician and 
     could not access her medical records. 
  -  Regarding Patient F, she found Dr. Romanescu’s office closed until further notice when 
     calling to make an appointment. She wrote in for her medical records but did not receive 
     any communication back from Dr. Romanescu. 
  -  Regarding Patient G, his daughter was having trouble obtaining medical records for him. 
     After receiving a colonoscopy report from Dr. Romanescu, Patient G’s daughter 
     informed the College that he had been recently diagnosed with cancer by his new 
     physician.  
  -  Regarding Patient H, she had been unable to obtain her medical records from Dr. 
      Romanescu. She found the telephone disconnected after trying to make an appointment.  
   -  Regarding Patient I, she was upset about not being notified of the closure because she is 
      diabetic and visited the office regularly. Dr. Romanescu was also rude to her at her last 
      appointment.  
  
In addition to the formal complaints, the College received numerous additional contacts from 
patients who shared similar experiences and expressed frustration that Dr. Romanescu had closed 
her office abruptly, without prior notice, and without having made prior arrangements to address 
patient requests for such things as obtaining their medical records, prescription renewals and test 
results should she be unable to work in the future.  
 
In 2014, Dr. Romanescu provided medical records to each of the nine complainants at no cost. 
Dr. Romanescu also provided a copy of her medical records requested by all other patients who 
requested them at no cost following the closure of her office in November 2013. In addition, Dr. 
Romanescu mailed out hundreds of test results, consultation notes and other medical records that 
she received following the closure of her office at no cost. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Romanescu’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) 
      month, commencing immediately. 
   -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Romanescu’s 
      certificate of registration: 
      a) Effective immediately, Dr. Romanescu shall only practise in a group setting 
        acceptable to the College;   
      b) Dr. Romanescu shall provide notice to the College of the first day she returns to the 
        practice of medicine; 
      c) If Dr. Romanescu returns to practice prior to December 1, 2015, she shall undergo a 
        practice assessment, at the College’s expense, within three (3) to six (6) months of her 
        return to practice; and  
              

   d) If Dr. Romanescu returns to practice on or after December 1, 2015 she will be 
     required to abide by the re-entry to practice procedure outlined in the College policy 
     “Re-entering Practice”. 

   -   Dr. Romanescu appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Romanescu to pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460, within 60 days of the 
  date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 16, 2015