Romanova, Anna (CPSO#: 103344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medicine
D107 - Box 209
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13062
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ROMANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMANOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018