Romanowska, Karinka Isabelle (CPSO#: 94186)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Jagiellonian University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romanowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017