Romsa, Nancy Kathryn (CPSO#: 71451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Foley, Nancy Kathryn (used until: 09 Nov 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2051
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romsa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Romsa ( CPSO# 69886 )
Dr. N. Romsa ( CPSO# 71451 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
339 Windermere Road
C3-207 P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3433

Business Address:
St Thomas General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P.O. Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY KATHRYN ROMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999