Rondi, Kevin (CPSO#: 89647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Respirology

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2009 to 28 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2009 to 29 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2014