Rooney, Rachel Ann Dorothea (CPSO#: 78503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: Katocs, Rachel Ann Dorothea (used until: 05 Sep 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Rooney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Victory 2 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL ANN DOROTHEA ROONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2004 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2005