Rooney, Rebecca Amy (CPSO#: 72501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: Stulberg, Rebecca Amy (used until: 07 Nov 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B210
325 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone: (226) 730-0011
Fax: (226) 730-0012
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca A. Rooney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 72501 )

Business Address:
B210 -325 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 730-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA AMY ROONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003