Roqueyya, Rubina (CPSO#: 83038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Chittagong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Family Care Centre
2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1M3
Phone: (416) 690-9000
Fax: (416) 690-9005
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4
1269 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E6
Canada
Phone: (416) 477-1418
Fax: (416) 690-9005
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubina Roqueyya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Roqueyya ( CPSO# 83038 )

Business Address:
2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1M3
Phone Number: (416) 690-9000

Business Address:
4 - 1269 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M1J 1E6
Phone Number: (416) 477-1418

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBINA ROQUEYYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROQUEYYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008