Rosa, David Anthony (CPSO#: 96488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A6
4725 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone: (289) 296-2025
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

400 Scott Street
Grantham Walk in Clinic
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 937-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Rosa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosa ( CPSO# 96488 )

Business Address:
Grantham Walk In Clinic
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 937-0000

Business Address:
4725 Dorchester Road
Unit A6
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone Number: (289) 296-2025

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY ROSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2014