Rose, Gregory Walter (CPSO#: 76187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3A3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: 613-680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Rd.
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

60 Cambridge St. N.
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khamisa & Rose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rose ( CPSO# 76187 )
Dr. K. Khamisa ( CPSO# 77631 )

Business Address:
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3A3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
CPC 204
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Business Address:
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-7684

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY WALTER ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2006