Rose Selwin, Winsley (CPSO#: 92157)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 05 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012