Rosebush, David John (CPSO#: 82688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk Family Medical
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 766-1490
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Director
Norfolk Manor Retirement Home
128 Norfolk St
Guelph ON  N1H 4J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-1100
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Department of Hospital Medicine
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David J. Rosebush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosebush ( CPSO# 82688 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 766-1490

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
128 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 837-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN ROSEBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEBUSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007