Rosen, Irving Earl (CPSO#: 18039)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I.E. Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 85 Walmsley Boulevard Toronto ON M4V 1X7
Date Received: 03 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2018