Rosen-Zaidener, Dalia Sharon (CPSO#: 71634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 19569 Manulife PO
Toronto ON  M4W3T9
Phone: (905) 773-3884
Fax: 905-597-9282
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

373-E Vidal Street South
Sarnia, ON
Sarnia ON  N7T 2V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 491-2109
Fax: (519) 491-5438
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

45 Bloor Street East Unit 2, Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1H3L9
Canada
Phone: 905-443-0223
Fax: 905-443-0225
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay ON  P1B 1X4
Canada
Phone: (705) 497-1620
Fax: (705) 497-0552
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

OATC Bancroft
89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-0660
Fax: (613) 332-1551
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4M3
Canada
Phone: (807) 768-2910
Fax: (807) 768-2880
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

OATC Fort Frances
404 Scott Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1H2
Canada
Phone: (807) 274-8305
Fax: (807) 274-3656
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2M6
Canada
Phone: (519) 204-8430
Fax: (519) 204-8403
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 1A6
Canada
Phone: (807) 622-2900
Fax: (807) 622-2969
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3W2
Canada
Phone: (807) 577-3540
Fax: (807) 577-3675
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

OATC Keswick
204 Simcoe Ave., Units 1 & 2
Keswick, ON
Keswick ON  L4P 3S6
Canada
Phone: (905) 476-3737
Fax: (905) 476-9826
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

OATC Belleville
257 Front Street
Belleville, ON
Belleville ON  K8N 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7862
Fax: (613) 969-8219
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S6
Canada
Phone: (705) 250-5100
Fax: (705) 434-4555
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

211 Highland Street, Haliburton Ont
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: 705-455-9900
Fax: 705-455-9901
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

6 - 843 Red River Road, Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K3
Canada
Phone: 807-768-4352
Fax: 807-768-4375
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

401 Somerset Street West, Ottawa On
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1
Canada
Phone: 613-233-1114
Fax: 613-233-1141
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

215 Sherbrooke Street, Peterborough
Peterborough ON  K9J 2N2
Canada
Phone: 705-748-0995
Fax: 705-748-5946
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

1101 University Ave. West, Windsor
Windsor ON  N9A 5T1
Canada
Phone: 519-252-0991
Fax: 519-252-9821
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

9917 Tecumseh Rd., East, Windsor,
Windsor ON  N8R1A5
Canada
Phone: 519-735-6500
Fax: 519-735-6507
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Rosen-Zaidener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen-Zaidener ( CPSO# 71634 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-3884

Business Address:
OATC Fort Frances
404 Scott Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1H2
Phone Number: (807) 274-8305

Business Address:
OATC Bancroft
89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-0660

Business Address:
OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4M3
Phone Number: (807) 768-2910

Business Address:
OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S6
Phone Number: (705) 812-3822

Business Address:
OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay ON  P1B 1X4
Phone Number: (705) 497-1620

Business Address:
OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2M6
Phone Number: (519) 204-8430

Business Address:
OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 1A6
Phone Number: (807) 622-2900

Business Address:
OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3W2
Phone Number: (807) 577-3540

Business Address:
214 Main Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 597-1515

Business Address:
371 Simcoe Street
Beaverton ON  L0K 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 426-2362

Business Address:
257 Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3Z6
Phone Number: (613) 969-7862

Business Address:
211 Highland Street
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 455-9900

Business Address:
843 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K3
Phone Number: (807) 768-4352

Business Address:
Room 375-E
Vidal Street South
Sarnia ON  N7T 2V3

Business Address:
1101 University Avenue West
Windsor ON  N9A 1T1

Business Address:
9917 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8R 1A5
Phone Number: (519) 735-6500

Business Address:
Units 1 & 2
204 Simcoe Avenue
Keswick ON  L4P 3S6

Business Address:
401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1

Business Address:
45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1H 3L9

Business Address:
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K8

Business Address:
263 Montreal Road
Vanier ON  K1L 6C4

Business Address:
215 Sherbrooke Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2N2

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 or (888) 781-9083
Date Received: 23 Jan 2008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA SHARON ROSEN-ZAIDENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN-ZAIDENER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999