Rosenberg, Eli (CPSO#: 84069)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyla J. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2006 to 12 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2010 to 08 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013