Rosenberg, Jacob Judah (CPSO#: 92560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: (905) 850-5607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob J. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 92560 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB JUDAH ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2011