Rosenberg, Jodine Lisa (CPSO#: 92830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
272 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone: (416) 847-9999
Fax: (416) 847-8999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodine Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 92830 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
272 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone Number: (416) 847-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODINE LISA ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012