Rosenberg, Lara May (CPSO#: 89077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 223-0555
Fax: (416) 223-0540
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lara Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 89077 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA MAY ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011