Rosenberg, Marsha Heather (CPSO#: 58651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: Juravsky, Marsha Heather (used until: 25 Apr 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2882
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARSHA HEATHER ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1987