Rosenczweig, Carolyn Cathleen (CPSO#: 78593)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2007