Rosenthal, Gary Alan (CPSO#: 57790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 297-9611
Fax: (416) 292-8932
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary A. Rosenthal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rosenthal ( CPSO# 57790 )

Business Address:
303 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 297-9611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY ALAN ROSENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)