Rosenthall, Wendy (CPSO#: 32177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 1981

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 402
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 276-7224
Fax: (905) 276-2996
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Rosenthall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Rosenthall ( CPSO# 32177 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 276-7224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ROSENTHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1981

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)