Ross, Christopher Harold (CPSO#: 64094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2400 N Rockton Ave
Rockford IL  61103
United States
Phone: (815) 971-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HAROLD ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Nov 1993
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2003

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

As of September 18, 2016, the Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation restored Dr. Christopher Ross’s medical licence in Illinois from temporary suspension and placed his licence on probation until July 31, 2020 due to Dr. Ross suffering from prescription drug dependence. The College was notified of this by the physician on June 21, 2017.


Source: FSMB
Active Date: April 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

As of April 28, 2016, Dr. Christopher Ross was temporarily suspended from practice by the Medical Disciplinary Board under the Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation based on unprofessional conduct, namely stealing narcotics from patient for personal use. The College was notified of this suspension in May 2016 by a report dated May 16, 2016.