Ross, Ella Anna (CPSO#: 76520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 Beechwood Ave
Ottawa ON  K1L 8A8
Phone: (613) 842-4545
Fax: (613) 842-9191
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8537
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8575
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross EA Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ross ( CPSO# 76520 )

Business Address:
208 Beechwood Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8A8
Phone Number: (613) 842-4545

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLA ANNA ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006