Ross, Ian Greg (CPSO#: 73518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52343
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ross ( CPSO# 73518 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GREG ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004