Ross, Jay Jonathan (CPSO#: 76190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2340 Pembina Highway
Winnipeg MB  R3T 2E8
Phone: 2045104688
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 Richmond park drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY JONATHAN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010