Ross, Joel Emmanuel (CPSO#: 72513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3C3
Phone: (416) 392-5767
Fax: (416) 397-5686
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cedarvale Terrace
Long Term Care Home
429 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Office of the Chief Coroner of
Ontario
25 Morton Shulman Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Fax: (416) 314-4030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 72513 )

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 314-4000

Business Address:
Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 392-5767

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL EMMANUEL ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2001