Rostas, Aaron Graham (CPSO#: 96238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Rostas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rostas ( CPSO# 96238 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON GRAHAM ROSTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2011 to 30 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012