Rostom, Krista Leigh (CPSO#: 100573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Butts, Krista Leigh (used until: 10 Oct 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive, Box 37
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTA LEIGH ROSTOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018