Rotaru, Carmen (CPSO#: 91993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Ovidius Constanta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3546
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carmen Rotaru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rotaru ( CPSO# 91993 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Carmen Rotaru may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.