Rotenberg, Brian William (CPSO#: 74723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital, B2-501
PO Box 5777, Stn. B.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6320
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Rotenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rotenberg ( CPSO# 74723 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
Suite B2-501
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM ROTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006