Roth Albin, Karina Vanessa (CPSO#: 86842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 624-9583
Fax: (519) 624-6825
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Roth Albin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Roth Albin ( CPSO# 86842 )

Business Address:
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 624-9583

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARINA VANESSA ROTH ALBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH ALBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013