Roth, Kirk Martin (CPSO#: 86756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1844 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R9
Phone: (519) 277-4515
Fax: (519) 888-8272
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liu ( CPSO# 82727 )
Dr. K. Roth ( CPSO# 86756 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4348

Business Address:
29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 603-0223

Business Address:
1844 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R9
Phone Number: (519) 277-4515

Business Address:
110 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 780-5298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRK MARTIN ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012