Roth, Leah Heather (CPSO#: 74575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grober Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth ( CPSO# 74575 )
Dr. E. Grober ( CPSO# 73894 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Murray Koffler Urologic Wellness
6th Floor, PO Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Ambulatory Surgery
76 Grenville Street
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH HEATHER ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002