Roth, Sherryn Naomi (CPSO#: 23948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-0041
Fax: (416) 431-0042
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRYN NAOMI ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1972