Rotstein, Jennifer Nicole (CPSO#: 77810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
383 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1Z3
Phone: (905) 201-8005
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

108-7381 Kennedy Rd Unit 8
Markham ON  L3R 5B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-2222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. N. Rotstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rotstein ( CPSO# 77810 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
383 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 201-8005

Business Address:
7381 Kennedy Road
Unit 108
Markham ON  L3R 5B5
Phone Number: (905) 946-2222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER NICOLE ROTSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004