Rouhani, Nassim (CPSO#: 94899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouhani Medical
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 601-6601
Fax: (519) 601-6603
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nassim Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rouhani ( CPSO# 94899 )

Business Address:
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 601-6601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
             Dr. Nassim Rouhani may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.