Rouhani, Shiva (CPSO#: 94769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Dec 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 601-6601
Fax: (519) 601-6603
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shiva Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rouhani ( CPSO# 94769 )

Business Address:
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 601-6601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shiva Rouhani may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.