Rouse, Tyler Braun (CPSO#: 77978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Pathology Room W3-408
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2873
Fax: (519) 272-8178
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tyler B. Rouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rouse ( CPSO# 77978 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Pathology
Room W3-408
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TYLER BRAUN ROUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2004 to 17 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007