Roushdi, Amani Edward Anis (CPSO#: 85277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2054
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10323 yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C1
Canada
Phone: 9052374632
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3001 hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 2460
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Kidz Clinic
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 303-0304
Fax: (905) 303-3035
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2 princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Ext. 8245
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Roushdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Roushdi ( CPSO# 85277 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANI EDWARD ANIS ROUSHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSHDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010