Rousseau, Erella (CPSO#: 51528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rousseau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rousseau ( CPSO# 51528 )

Business Address:
1077 North Service Road
Unit 27
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 949-1700

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 21 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERELLA ROUSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1983