Rowe, Andrea Anne (CPSO#: 94981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Cardiac Care
150 Hespler Rd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union St E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rowe ( CPSO# 94981 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
150 Hespler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Phone Number: (519) 624-3511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Andrea Anne Rowe may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine,
            only.