Rowe, David Simon (CPSO#: 96995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 Campbell drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Canada
Phone: 9058529771
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket
ON
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David S. Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rowe ( CPSO# 96995 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SIMON ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014