Rowe, Neal Ernest (CPSO#: 86445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue, Section B3
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-4500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neal E. Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rowe ( CPSO# 86445 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Section B3
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL ERNEST ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012