Roy, Alexandra (CPSO#: 91002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Centre
2-1650 Queensdale avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: (613) 244-4400
Fax: (613) 244-3399
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012