Roy, Anvesh (CPSO#: 87159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Complex Mental Illness Program
CAMH
250 College Street - Room 721
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34362
Fax: 416-260-4197
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anvesh Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Roy ( CPSO# 87159 )

Business Address:
Complex Mental Illness Program
CAMH
Suite 713
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Suite 2
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANVESH ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015