Roy, Debashis (CPSO#: 90110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 10 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Silchar Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBASHIS ROY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ROY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ROY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2019 to 10 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2019 to 07 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019