Roy, Marc Andre (CPSO#: 95874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: 705-267-6340
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Andre Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 95874 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P3
Phone Number: (705) 288-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013