Roy, Melanie (CPSO#: 92859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1250 Boulevard Rene-Levesque Ouest
Montreal QC  H3B 5W8
Phone: (514) 845-1515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016